Home > Brookline Bank > History
Brookline Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Brookline Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1871-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Brookline Savings Bank | |
1991-03-14 | Acquired Coolidge Corner Co-operative Bank (26557) in BROOKLINE, MA | |
1998-03-24 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-03-24 | Reorganized. | |
2001-07-17 | Acquired Lighthouse Bank (35449) in WALTHAM, MA | |
2001-07-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
2001-07-17 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2003-01-17 | Changed name to Brookline Bank | |
2005-01-07 | Acquired Medford Co-operative Bank (26572) in MEDFORD, MA | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-06-29 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2012-06-29 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2012-06-29 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2018-03-01 | Acquired First Commons Bank, National Association (58923) in NEWTON CENTER, MA | |
2019-07-31 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2020-02-15 | Acquired First Ipswich Bank (2595) in IPSWICH, MA |