Home > Boston Trust Walden Company > History
Boston Trust Walden Company, History
The following are major historical events for Boston Trust Walden Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1960-12-14 | Institution established: Original name:Brighton Bank and Trust Company | |
1967-11-20 | Changed name to Barclay Bank and Trust Company of Boston | |
1971-12-30 | Changed name to United States Trust Company | |
1971-12-30 | Acquired United States Trust Company (15) in BOSTON, MA | |
1980-11-01 | Acquired City Bank & Trust Company (17714) in BOSTON, MA | |
1990-09-07 | Acquired Home Owners Savings Bank F.S.B. (29581) in BOSTON, MA | |
2003-10-29 | Changed name to Boston Trust & Investment Management Company | |
2019-09-04 | Changed name to Boston Trust Walden Company |