Border State Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Border State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1935-08-09Institution established: Original name:Greenbush State Bank
1995-01-01Changed name to Border State Bank of Greenbush
2003-05-12Acquired First National Bank (16225) in THIEF RIVER FALLS, MN
2003-08-11Acquired Border State Bank (16777) in ROSEAU, MN
2003-08-11Changed name to Border State Bank
2005-12-16Acquired Border State Bank of International Falls (35471) in INTERNATIONAL FALLS, MN
2016-10-11Acquired First Advantage Bank (57596) in COON RAPIDS, MN
2018-10-15Acquired First State Bank of Clearbrook (10559) in CLEARBROOK, MN