Home > Boonville Federal Savings Bank > History
Boonville Federal Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Boonville Federal Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1917-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Boonville Savings Association | |
1986-08-31 | Changed name to Boonville FSB | |
1986-08-31 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-05-31 | Changed name to Boonville Federal Savings Bank | |
2012-05-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2012-05-31 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2017-06-27 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED |