Home > BNY Mellon > History
BNY Mellon, History
The following are major historical events for BNY Mellon, including mergers and acquisitions.
1869-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Mellon National Bank of Pittsburgh | |
1944-02-07 | Changed name to Mellon National Bank | |
1946-09-23 | Changed name to Mellon National Bank and Trust Company | |
1972-11-22 | Changed name to Mellon Bank, N. A. | |
1982-09-21 | Moved bank headquarters from PITTSBURGH, PA to GREENSBURG, PA | |
1985-01-07 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank of New Castle (7931) in NEW CASTLE, PA | |
1991-01-01 | Acquired Mellon Bank (East) PSFS, National Association (716) in PHILADELPHIA, PA | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired Mellon Bank (North) National Association (788) in OIL CITY, PA | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired The Commonwealth National Bank (7517) in HARRISBURG, PA | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired Mellon Bank (Central) National Association (7594) in STATE COLLEGE, PA | |
1991-12-31 | Acquired United Penn Bank (7808) in WILKES BARRE, PA | |
1992-12-11 | Acquired Meritor Savings Bank (15750) in PHILADELPHIA, PA | |
1995-05-19 | Acquired Glendale Bank of Pennsylvania (27137) in PHILADELPHIA, PA | |
1996-06-01 | Moved bank headquarters from GREENSBURG, PA to PITTSBURGH, PA | |
1996-11-23 | Acquired Mellon PSFS (NJ) National Association (21183) in VOORHEES TOWNSHIP, NJ | |
2000-04-01 | Acquired Mellon Bank MD National Association (26672) in ROCKVILLE, MD | |
2003-09-15 | Acquired Mellon Bank Delaware, National Association (11653) in WILMINGTON, DE | |
2008-01-15 | Acquired Mellon Florida Interim National Bank (34564) in MIAMI, FL | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired Mellon Trust of New England, National Association (22295) in BOSTON, MA | |
2008-07-01 | Changed name to BNY Mellon, National Association | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired Mellon California Interim National Bank, Los Angeles, California (27110) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired Mellon New York Interim National Bank, LLC (33553) in NEW YORK, NY | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired Mellon Washington Interim National Bank, Seattle, Washington (33777) in BELLEVUE, WA | |
2009-07-06 | Acquired Bank of New York Trust Company (91223) in NEW YORK, NY |