Home > Benchmark Bank > History
Benchmark Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Benchmark Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1964-08-29 | Institution established: Original name:Quinlan State Bank | |
1985-05-16 | Reorganized. | |
1988-01-07 | Acquired Commerce Bank of Plano (26540) in PLANO, TX | |
1988-04-01 | Changed name to Benchmark Bank | |
1988-07-14 | Acquired Allen National Bank (23380) in ALLEN, TX | |
1996-03-29 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (1718) in ROYSE CITY, TX | |
2001-06-08 | Acquired Lone Oak State Bank (20299) in LONE OAK, TX | |
2002-05-28 | Moved bank headquarters from QUINLAN, TX to PLANO, TX |