Home > BCB Community Bank > History
BCB Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for BCB Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2000-11-01 | Institution established: Original name:BAYONNE COMMUNITY BANK | |
2007-04-09 | Changed name to BCB Community Bank | |
2010-07-06 | Acquired Pamrapo Savings Bank, SLA (30579) in BAYONNE, NJ | |
2011-10-14 | Acquired Allegiance Community Bank (35265) in SOUTH ORANGE, NJ | |
2018-04-17 | Acquired Indus American Bank (57983) in EDISON, NJ |