Home > BayCoast Bank > History
BayCoast Bank, History
The following are major historical events for BayCoast Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1851-11-15 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Union Savings Bank | |
1983-10-28 | Changed name to Citizens-Union Savings Bank | |
1983-10-28 | Acquired Citizens Savings Bank (90193) in FALL RIVER, MA | |
1985-06-18 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1986-07-11 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1998-02-24 | Reorganized. | |
1998-02-24 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Fall River, a Co-operative Bank (26551) in FALL RIVER, MA | |
2012-01-17 | Changed name to BayCoast Bank | |
2016-03-30 | Moved bank headquarters from FALL RIVER, MA to SWANSEA, MA |