Home > Banner Bank > History

Banner Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Banner Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1890-01-01Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings and Loan Association
1982-04-30Acquired Home Federal Savings and Loan Association (30298) in YAKIMA, WA
1988-01-31Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1988-04-30Changed name to First Federal Savings Bank of Washington
1991-10-01Changed name to First Savings Bank of Washington
1995-10-31Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1999-01-04Acquired Whatcom State Bank (23164) in BELLINGHAM, WA
1999-04-01Acquired Seaport Citizens' Bank (22951) in LEWISTON, ID
2000-10-30Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK
2000-10-30Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2000-10-30Acquired Towne Bank (33349) in WOODINVILLE, WA
2000-10-30Changed name to Banner Bank
2000-10-30Reorganized.
2001-09-28Acquired Banner Bank of Oregon (16676) in HERMISTON, OR
2002-01-01Acquired Oregon Business Bank (35256) in LAKE OSWEGO, OR
2007-05-01Acquired F&M Bank (13375) in SPOKANE VALLEY, WA
2007-10-10Acquired NCW Community Bank (35336) in WENATCHEE, WA
2015-03-06Acquired Siuslaw Bank (19006) in FLORENCE, OR
2015-10-02Acquired AmericanWest Bank (22441) in SPOKANE, WA
2018-11-01Acquired Skagit Bank (17874) in BURLINGTON, WA
2019-11-01Acquired AltaPacific Bank (58275) in SANTA ROSA, CA