Home > BankPlus > History

BankPlus, History

The following are a list of major historical events for BankPlus, including mergers and acquisitions.

1909-01-01Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank & Trust Company
1965-11-01Changed name to Citizens National Bank of Belzoni
1993-05-03Acquired Bank of Flora (12440) in FLORA, MS
1994-09-27Changed name to BankPlus
1994-10-06Acquired Southeast Mississippi Bank (8236) in QUITMAN, MS
1996-12-13Acquired BankPlus SSB (30781) in MERIDIAN, MS
2000-06-26Acquired First National Bank of Holmes County (5004) in LEXINGTON, MS
2020-04-01Acquired State Bank & Trust Company (8878) in GREENWOOD, MS