Home > BankFlorida > History
BankFlorida, History
The following are major historical events for BankFlorida, including mergers and acquisitions.
2007-08-27 | Institution established: Original name:FirstCity Bank of Commerce | |
2013-11-08 | Moved bank headquarters from NORTH PALM BEACH, FL to PALM BEACH GARDENS, FL | |
2018-10-18 | Changed name to BankFlorida | |
2019-04-15 | Moved bank headquarters from PALM BEACH GARDENS, FL to JUPITER, FL | |
2021-08-26 | Moved bank headquarters from 12612 Us Highway 301, Dade City, FL to 12612 Us Highway 301, Dade City, FL. |