Home > BankFirst > History

BankFirst, History

The following are a list of major historical events for BankFirst, including mergers and acquisitions.

1970-02-09Institution established: Original name:Bank of Norfolk
1986-09-16Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1986-10-29Acquired First Savings Company of Norfolk (24622) in NORFOLK, NE
2002-11-16Acquired Columbus FSB (29775) in COLUMBUS, NE
2002-11-18Changed name to BankFirst
2018-12-10Acquired Iowa - Nebraska State Bank (8354) in SOUTH SIOUX CITY, NE