Home > BankFirst Financial Services > History
BankFirst Financial Services, History
The following are major historical events for BankFirst Financial Services, including mergers and acquisitions.
1888-06-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Merchants and Farmers Bank | |
1988-03-14 | Reorganized. | |
1999-07-12 | Changed name to BankFirst Financial Services | |
2012-12-14 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2012-12-14 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-08-03 | Moved bank headquarters from MACON, MS to COLUMBUS, MS | |
2015-09-01 | Acquired Newton County Bank (9367) in NEWTON, MS | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired FNB Of Central Alabama (19468) in ALICEVILLE, AL | |
2020-07-01 | Acquired Traders & Farmers Bank (47) in HALEYVILLE, AL |