Bankesb, History
The following are major historical events for Bankesb, including mergers and acquisitions.
1869-02-10 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Easthampton Savings Bank | |
1985-09-05 | Became FDIC insured. | |
2008-10-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2012-11-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2012-11-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2015-06-30 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank (2521) in PUTNAM, CT | |
2024-01-29 | Changed name to Bankesb. |