Bank Star, History
The following are major historical events for Bank Star, including mergers and acquisitions.
1975-01-15 | Institution established: Original name:American Security Bank of Pacific | |
1980-02-27 | Changed name to Commerce Bank of Pacific | |
1985-06-28 | Changed name to Commerce Bank of Pacific, National Association | |
1987-03-24 | Changed name to Pacific National Bank | |
1993-04-13 | Changed name to Security Pacific Bank | |
2000-05-15 | Changed name to Bank Star | |
2018-08-27 | Acquired Bank of Hillsboro (15821) in HILLSBORO, MO |