Bank of the West, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Bank of the West, including mergers and acquisitions.

1874-01-01Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of San Jose
1972-05-01Acquired Commercial National Bank of San Leandro (19322) in SAN LEANDRO, CA
1974-07-31Acquired Hayward National Bank (19155) in HAYWARD, CA
1979-01-02Changed name to Bank of the West
1980-03-18Moved bank headquarters from SAN JOSE, CA to SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1980-03-18Acquired French Bank of California (20721) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1987-07-23Acquired Bank of Los Gatos, National Association (25285) in LOS GATOS, CA
1990-05-21Acquired Central Bank (17489) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1992-04-10Acquired Atlantic Financial Federal Savings Bank (33466) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
1996-04-29Acquired Northbay Savings Bank, FSB (31483) in PETALUMA, CA
1998-11-01Acquired Pacific One Bank (34181) in PORTLAND, OR
1999-07-01Acquired SierraWest Bank (23323) in TRUCKEE, CA
2001-02-16Acquired First Security Bank of New Mexico, National Association (2233) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM
2002-04-01Acquired UNITED CALIFORNIA BANK (20589) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2004-01-01Reorganized.
2004-12-03Acquired Community First National Bank (3924) in FARGO, ND
2005-02-08Acquired Union Safe Deposit Bank (8473) in STOCKTON, CA
2005-12-03Acquired Commercial Federal Bank, a Federal Savings Bank (30341) in OMAHA, NE