Home > Bank of Springfield > History
Bank of Springfield, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of Springfield, including mergers and acquisitions.
1965-10-29 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Springfield | |
1978-05-11 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1988-03-31 | Reorganized. | |
2003-05-27 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2003-05-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS TERMINATED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2014-08-02 | Acquired First Community State Bank (20028) in STAUNTON, IL |