Home > Bank of New Hampshire > History
Bank of New Hampshire, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of New Hampshire, including mergers and acquisitions.
1831-07-02 | Institution established: Original name:Laconia Savings Bank | |
1994-07-22 | Acquired HomeBank Federal Savings Association (33512) in GILFORD, NH as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
1996-05-07 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1998-07-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
2005-10-01 | Acquired Village Bank & Trust Company (23675) in GILFORD, NH | |
2012-05-03 | Changed name to Bank of New Hampshire | |
2016-05-06 | Acquired Community Guaranty Savings Bank (27252) in PLYMOUTH, NH |