Bank of Hillsboro, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Bank of Hillsboro, including mergers and acquisitions.

1945-07-02Institution established: Original name:National Bank of Mount Olive
1993-12-01Changed name to National Bank
1995-08-23Moved bank headquarters from MOUNT OLIVE, IL to HILLSBORO, IL
1995-08-23Acquired County National Bank (1044) in HILLSBORO, IL
1996-09-17Acquired Security Savings Bank, F.S.B. (33106) in HILLSBORO, IL
1997-01-17Acquired State Bank of Keyesport (11673) in KEYESPORT, IL
2008-10-10Acquired Meridian Bank (13789) in ELDRED, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2018-09-18Changed name to Bank of Hillsboro, National Association