Home > Bank of America > History

Bank of America, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Bank of America, including mergers and acquisitions.

1904-10-17Institution established: Original name:Bank of America National Trust and Savings Association
1990-04-27Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association (28119) in BAKERSFIELD, CA
1990-04-27Acquired The Guardian Federal Savings and Loan Association (32142) in BAKERSFIELD, CA
1990-11-16Acquired Southwest Federal Savings Association (32814) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1991-08-09Acquired Santa Barbara Federal Savings and Loan Association (33044) in SANTA BARBARA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
1992-04-22Acquired Security Pacific National Bank (3469) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1996-07-01Acquired Bank of America Oregon (22911) in PORTLAND, OR
1996-09-01Acquired Bankamerica National Trust Company (24430) in NEW YORK CITY, NY
1997-01-01Acquired Bank of America Arizona (32971) in PHOENIX, AZ
1997-01-01Acquired Bank of America NW, National Association (2970) in SEATTLE, WA
1997-01-01Acquired Bank of America, National Association (17300) in LAS VEGAS, NV
1997-01-01Acquired Bank of America New Mexico, National Association (33326) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM
1997-01-01Acquired Bank of America-Alaska, National Association (20209) in ANCHORAGE, AK
1997-07-01Acquired Bank of America Illinois (3622) in CHICAGO, IL
1997-07-01Acquired Bank of America Trust Company of Florida, National Association (23691) in BOCA RATON, FL
1999-07-23Changed name to Bank of America, National Association
1999-07-23Moved bank headquarters from SAN FRANCISCO, CA to CHARLOTTE, NC
1999-07-23Acquired Bank of America, National Association (15802) in CHARLOTTE, NC
1999-12-01Acquired Bank of America Utah, National Association (9575) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
2001-05-31Acquired NationsBank Trust Company of New York (33937) in NEW YORK, NY
2005-06-13Acquired Fleet National Bank (2558) in PROVIDENCE, RI
2006-09-22Acquired MBNA America Delaware, National Association (34680) in WILMINGTON, DE
2008-02-22Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association (34061) in NEW YORK, NY
2008-06-30Acquired Bank of America Georgia, National Association (57117) in ATLANTA, GA
2008-10-17Acquired LaSalle Bank Midwest National Association (22488) in TROY, MI
2008-10-17Acquired LaSalle Bank National Association (15407) in CHICAGO, IL
2009-01-16Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27Acquired Countrywide Bank, FSB (33143) in CENTENNIAL, CO
2009-07-01Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank USA (27374) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
2009-11-02Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., FSB (34571) in NEW YORK, NY
2013-04-01Acquired Bank of America, Rhode Island, National Association (58032) in PROVIDENCE, RI
2013-04-01Acquired Bank of America Oregon, National Association (35453) in PORTLAND, OR
2014-10-01Acquired FIA Card Services, National Association (33318) in WILMINGTON, DE
2020-03-31Acquired Recontrust Company, National Association (58026) in SIMI VALLEY, CA