Bank Iowa, History
The following are major historical events for Bank Iowa, including mergers and acquisitions.
1923-03-07 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens State Bank | |
1941-07-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1941-07-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1978-01-20 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1978-01-20 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1989-11-01 | Acquired The Nodaway Valley National Bank of Villisca (13998) in VILLISCA, IA | |
1998-06-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1998-06-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2003-09-01 | Changed name to Bank Iowa | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired Bank Iowa (33927) in ALTOONA, IA | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired Bank Iowa (11354) in OSKALOOSA, IA | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired Bank Iowa (10130) in HUMBOLDT, IA | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired Bank Iowa (5801) in DENISON, IA | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired BANK IOWA (15736) in NEW HAMPTON, IA | |
2011-03-31 | Acquired Bank Iowa (4456) in RED OAK, IA | |
2011-04-14 | Moved bank headquarters from CLARINDA, IA to WEST DES MOINES, IA | |
2019-12-02 | Acquired First State Bank of Colfax (4440) in COLFAX, IA |