Home > Bank Forward > History
Bank Forward, History
The following are major historical events for Bank Forward, including mergers and acquisitions.
1927-09-05 | Institution established: Original name:Security State Bank of Hannaford | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank of Wimbledon (9424) in WIMBLEDON, ND | |
1991-10-01 | Changed name to Security State Bank of North Dakota | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired The First State Bank of New Rockford (15314) in NEW ROCKFORD, ND | |
1993-02-16 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (18881) in CARRINGTON, ND | |
1995-10-02 | Reorganized. | |
2006-04-01 | Acquired Centennial National Bank (34305) in WALKER, MN | |
2007-01-01 | Changed name to Bank Forward | |
2022-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from 5650 37th Ave S, FARGO, ND to 5650 37th Ave S, FARGO, ND. |