Home > Bank First, N.A. > History
Bank First, N.A., History
The following are major historical events for Bank First, N.A., including mergers and acquisitions.
1894-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank in Manitowoc | |
1971-06-15 | Acquired State Bank of Francis Creek (12783) in FRANCIS CREEK, WI | |
1985-10-01 | Acquired St. Nazianz State Bank (17216) in ST. NAZIANZ, WI | |
1999-12-17 | Acquired Dairy State Bank (16721) in PLYMOUTH, WI | |
2007-11-01 | Changed name to Bank First National | |
2017-10-27 | Acquired First National Bank (15149) in WAUPACA, WI | |
2018-04-26 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2018-10-16 | Changed name to Bank First, N.A. | |
2019-07-12 | Acquired Partnership Bank (10007) in CEDARBURG, WI | |
2020-05-15 | Acquired Timberwood Bank (15158) in TOMAH, WI |