Home > Bangor Savings Bank > History
Bangor Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Bangor Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1852-02-14 | Institution established: Original name:Bangor Savings Bank | |
1976-08-31 | Acquired Piscataquis Savings Bank (18410) in DOVER-FOXCROFT, ME | |
1977-04-01 | Acquired Eastport Savings Bank (12003) in EASTPORT, ME | |
1981-10-01 | Acquired Houlton Savings Bank (15217) in HOULTON, ME | |
1981-10-01 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2007-04-03 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2007-07-31 | Acquired Pepperell Bank & Trust (12873) in BIDDEFORD, ME | |
2018-04-06 | Acquired Granite Bank (6212) in COLEBROOK, NH |