BancorpSouth Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for BancorpSouth Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1876-03-01Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Tupelo
1966-09-19Changed name to Bank of Mississippi
1971-08-12Acquired The Bank of Houston (12202) in HOUSTON, MS
1973-07-26Acquired The Bank of West Point (9786) in WEST POINT, MS
1973-10-24Acquired Bank of Olive Branch (10590) in OLIVE BRANCH, MS
1974-06-29Acquired Grenada Trust and Banking Company (15870) in GRENADA, MS
1980-05-12Acquired Security Bank of Hernando (21099) in HERNANDO, MS
1982-04-15Acquired Monroe Banking and Trust Company (8242) in ABERDEEN, MS
1987-01-01Acquired First Mississippi National Bank (4986) in HATTIESBURG, MS
1987-04-22Acquired Bank of North Mississippi (11426) in OAKLAND, MS
1987-05-28Acquired The American Bank (21694) in VICKSBURG, MS
1994-04-15Acquired Security Federal Savings and Loan Association (33711) in JACKSON, MS as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-08-01Acquired First Federal Bank for Savings (28906) in STARKVILLE, MS
1996-12-16Acquired Laurel Federal Savings and Loan Association (29911) in LAUREL, MS
1997-03-03Acquired Iuka Guaranty Bank (10589) in IUKA, MS
1997-06-20Changed name to BancorpSouth Bank
1997-06-20Acquired Volunteer Bank (9958) in JACKSON, TN
1998-10-30Acquired First Community Bank of The South (1747) in FORT DEPOSIT, AL
1998-10-30Acquired Highland Bank (27403) in BIRMINGHAM, AL
1998-12-04Acquired Merchants Bank (4997) in VICKSBURG, MS
1998-12-31Acquired The First National Bank of Opelika (2819) in OPELIKA, AL
1999-02-27Acquired The Home Bank (22408) in GUNTERSVILLE, AL
2000-09-01Acquired First United Trust Company, National Association (34141) in EL DORADO, AR
2000-09-01Acquired First United Bank (3893) in STUTTGART, AR
2000-09-01Acquired City Bank & Trust of Shreveport, Louisiana (23895) in SHREVEPORT, LA
2000-09-01Acquired Fredonia State Bank (19067) in NACOGDOCHES, TX
2000-09-01Acquired Merchants and Planters Bank, National Association (11253) in CAMDEN, AR
2000-09-01Acquired The First National Bank of El Dorado (3859) in EL DORADO, AR
2000-09-01Acquired The City National Bank of Fort Smith (3865) in FORT SMITH, AR
2000-09-01Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Hope (3876) in HOPE, AR
2000-09-01Acquired First Republic Bank (17107) in MONROE, LA
2000-09-01Acquired FirstBank (18052) in TEXARKANA, TX
2000-09-01Acquired The Bank of North Arkansas (1530) in MELBOURNE, AR
2000-09-01Acquired First National Bank of Magnolia (14336) in MAGNOLIA, AR
2000-10-31Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association (27634) in TEXARKANA, AR
2002-02-28Acquired Pinnacle Bank (34408) in LITTLE ROCK, AR
2004-12-31Acquired Premier Bank of Brentwood (34541) in BRENTWOOD, TN
2004-12-31Acquired The Business Bank (34886) in BATON ROUGE, LA
2005-12-01Acquired American State Bank (5617) in JONESBORO, AR
2006-09-01Acquired First Kensington Bank (35327) in TAMPA, FL
2007-07-02Acquired The Signature Bank (34505) in SPRINGFIELD, MO
2017-10-31Reorganized.
2018-01-15Reorganized.
2018-01-15Acquired Ouachita Independent Bank (34332) in MONROE, LA
2018-01-15Acquired First State Bank Central Texas (11151) in AUSTIN, TX
2018-10-01Acquired Icon Bank of Texas, National Association (58378) in HOUSTON, TX
2019-04-01Acquired Grand Bank of Texas (22040) in DALLAS, TX
2019-04-01Acquired Merchants Bank (18637) in JACKSON, AL