Home > Banco do Brasil Americas > History
Banco do Brasil Americas, History
The following are major historical events for Banco do Brasil Americas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1986-07-24 | Institution established: Original name:Transflorida Bank of Palm Beach | |
1991-07-05 | Moved bank headquarters from BOYNTON BEACH, FL to BOCA RATON, FL | |
1991-07-16 | Changed name to EuroBank | |
2006-10-02 | Moved bank headquarters from BOCA RATON, FL to CORAL GABLES, FL | |
2012-10-04 | Changed name to Banco do Brasil Americas | |
2013-04-15 | Moved bank headquarters from CORAL GABLES, FL to MIAMI, FL |