b1BANK, History
The following are major historical events for b1BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.
2006-02-01 | Institution established: Original name:Business First Bank | |
2012-12-11 | Reorganized. | |
2015-04-01 | Acquired American Gateway Bank (313) in BATON ROUGE, LA | |
2018-01-01 | Acquired MBL Bank (29829) in MINDEN, LA | |
2018-12-01 | Acquired Richland State Bank (8526) in RAYVILLE, LA | |
2019-12-01 | Changed name to b1BANK | |
2020-05-01 | Acquired PEDESTAL BANK (35005) in HOUMA, LA |