Home > Avidia Bank > History
Avidia Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Avidia Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1869-02-26 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Hudson Savings Bank | |
1985-11-27 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1992-12-29 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1993-03-11 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1997-11-01 | Reorganized. | |
1997-11-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2007-08-24 | Changed name to Avidia Bank | |
2007-08-24 | Acquired Westborough Savings Bank (90299) in WESTBOROUGH, MA |