Home > AuburnBank > History
AuburnBank, History
The following are major historical events for AuburnBank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-01-03 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Auburn | |
1942-12-18 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1942-12-18 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1964-06-20 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1964-06-20 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
1964-06-20 | Changed name to Auburn National Bank of Auburn | |
1985-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
1995-04-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1995-04-01 | Changed name to AuburnBank |