Home > Associated Bank > History

Associated Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Associated Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1874-01-01Institution established: Original name:Kellogg-Citizens National Bank of Green Bay
1989-01-01Acquired Associated De Pere Bank (15182) in DE PERE, WI
1993-01-01Changed name to Associated Bank Green Bay, National Association
1993-01-01Acquired First National Bank of Sturgeon Bay (19738) in STURGEON BAY, WI
1993-07-01Acquired Farmers State Bank (13061) in POUND, WI
1998-11-12Reorganized.
1999-06-18Acquired Citizens Bank, National Association (15155) in SHAWANO, WI
2001-04-20Acquired Associated Bank, National Association (5311) in NEENAH, WI
2001-04-20Changed name to Associated Bank, National Association
2001-04-20Acquired Associated Bank Milwaukee (1509) in MILWAUKEE, WI
2001-05-25Acquired Associated Bank South Central (13237) in MADISON, WI
2001-05-25Acquired Associated Bank North (12340) in WAUSAU, WI
2001-05-25Acquired Associated Bank Lakeshore, National Association (11619) in MANITOWOC, WI
2003-09-12Acquired Associated Card Services Bank, National Association (34208) in STEVENS POINT, WI
2003-11-21Acquired Associated Bank Illinois, National Association (34916) in ROCKFORD, IL
2005-02-19Acquired First Federal Capital Bank (28981) in LA CROSSE, WI
2005-07-15Acquired Associated Bank Minnesota, National Association (18704) in MINNEAPOLIS, MN
2005-07-15Acquired Associated Bank Chicago (22177) in CHICAGO, IL
2005-10-21Reorganized.
2005-11-04Acquired State Financial Bank, National Association (3753) in HALES CORNERS, WI
2007-06-29Acquired The First National Bank of Hudson (5348) in WOODBURY, MN
2018-06-24Acquired Bank Mutual (30125) in BROWN DEER, WI
2020-02-14Acquired The First National Bank in Staunton (14924) in STAUNTON, IL