Home > Arvest Bank > History

Arvest Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Arvest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1871-01-01Institution established: Original name:McIlroy Bank & Trust Company
1976-07-12Changed name to McIlroy Bank & Trust
1990-11-02Acquired First Federal Savings and Loan Association (30672) in FAYETTEVILLE, AR
2001-11-15Changed name to Arvest Bank
2001-11-15Acquired Central Bank and Trust (33242) in LITTLE ROCK, AR
2001-12-06Acquired Springdale Bank & Trust (11249) in SPRINGDALE, AR
2001-12-06Acquired The Farmers and Merchants Bank (8736) in PRAIRIE GROVE, AR
2002-02-08Acquired Arvest Bank (3879) in FORT SMITH, AR
2002-02-08Acquired Arvest Bank (34012) in JOPLIN, MO
2002-03-07Acquired Bank of Bentonville (100) in BENTONVILLE, AR
2002-03-07Acquired First Arvest Bank (14648) in SILOAM SPRINGS, AR
2002-04-18Acquired WestStar Bank (4039) in BARTLESVILLE, OK
2002-04-18Acquired Arvest State Bank (25661) in TULSA, OK
2002-05-16Acquired Arvest Bank (26867) in NORMAN, OK
2002-05-16Acquired Arvest Bank (4081) in DUNCAN, OK
2002-05-16Acquired Arvest Bank (13595) in SHAWNEE, OK
2002-06-13Acquired Arvest Bank (3891) in ROGERS, AR
2003-07-01Acquired The Bank of Yellville (16354) in YELLVILLE, AR
2003-12-05Acquired Superior Bank, FSB (28958) in FORT SMITH, AR
2007-01-05Acquired The Caney Valley National Bank (4633) in CANEY, KS
2009-12-11Acquired SolutionsBank (4731) in OVERLAND PARK, KS as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-01-25Reorganized.
2013-03-29Acquired Arvest Trust Company, National Association (33148) in ROGERS, AR
2013-12-07Acquired National Bank of Arkansas in North Little Rock (23331) in NORTH LITTLE ROCK, AR
2018-04-21Acquired Bear State Bank (3857) in LITTLE ROCK, AR