Home > Arrowhead Bank > History
Arrowhead Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Arrowhead Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1923-03-16 | Institution established: Original name:Moore State Bank | |
1966-12-12 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1966-12-12 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1980-11-26 | Changed name to First Llano Bank | |
1991-08-29 | Acquired The San Saba National Bank (5519) in SAN SABA, TX | |
1992-02-19 | Changed name to Arrowhead Bank |