Home > Armor Bank > History
Armor Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Armor Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1919-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Forrest City Savings and Loan Association | |
1994-06-22 | Changed name to Forrest City Savings and Loan Association, F.A. | |
1995-06-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1995-06-01 | Changed name to Forrest City Bank, FSB | |
1997-01-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
1997-01-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1997-01-01 | Changed name to Forrest City Bank, National Association | |
2017-01-11 | Changed name to Armor Bank, National Association | |
2018-06-29 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2018-06-29 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2018-06-29 | Changed name to Armor Bank | |
2019-11-25 | Acquired First Delta Bank (17047) in MARKED TREE, AR |