Home > Armed Forces Bank > History
Armed Forces Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Armed Forces Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Army National Bank of Fort Leavenworth | |
1989-07-01 | Acquired Fort Carson National Bank (19683) in FORT CARSON, CO | |
1990-01-25 | Changed name to Army National Bank | |
1997-01-01 | Changed name to Armed Forces Bank, National Association | |
1999-01-31 | Reorganized. | |
2006-06-23 | Acquired Fort Riley National Bank (19746) in FORT RILEY, KS | |
2010-12-10 | Acquired Bank Midwest, National Association (32964) in KANSAS CITY, MO | |
2015-06-19 | Acquired Armed Forces Bank of California, National Association (35354) in SAN DIEGO, CA |