Home > Anstaff Bank > History

Anstaff Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Anstaff Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1931-05-04Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank in Green Forest
1986-06-30Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1997-12-31Reorganized.
2014-07-27Changed name to Anstaff Bank, National Association
2016-06-28Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2016-06-28Changed name to Anstaff Bank
2016-06-28Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2017-03-06Acquired Twin Lakes Community Bank (15880) in FLIPPIN, AR