Home > AMG National Trust Bank > History
AMG National Trust Bank, History
The following are major historical events for AMG National Trust Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2001-08-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: AMG/Guaranty Trust, National Association | |
2004-03-01 | Reorganized. | |
2004-11-05 | Moved bank headquarters from GREENWOOD VILLAGE, CO to ENGLEWOOD, CO | |
2005-08-01 | Changed name to AMG National Trust Bank | |
2007-11-20 | Moved bank headquarters from ENGLEWOOD, CO to BOULDER, CO | |
2008-02-01 | Became FDIC insured. | |
2008-02-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2008-02-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK |