Home > Ameris Bank > History

Ameris Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Ameris Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1971-10-01Institution established: Original name:American Banking Company
1979-01-06Acquired Toney Brothers Bank (16294) in DOERUN, GA
1982-11-17Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2006-02-11Acquired Southland Bank b/b/a Ameris (5599) in DOTHAN, AL
2006-02-11Acquired First National Bank of South Georgia (33416) in ALBANY, GA
2006-02-11Acquired Citizens Security Bank (16987) in TIFTON, GA
2006-02-11Acquired Heritage Community Bank (9066) in QUITMAN, GA
2006-02-11Acquired Central Bank & Trust (32429) in CORDELE, GA
2006-02-11Acquired Merchants and Farmers Bank (15878) in DONALSONVILLE, GA
2006-03-04Acquired First National Bank (34844) in ORANGE PARK, FL
2006-03-04Acquired The First Bank of Brunswick (32988) in BRUNSWICK, GA
2006-12-08Acquired Bank of Thomas County (11293) in THOMASVILLE, GA
2006-12-08Changed name to Ameris Bank
2006-12-31Acquired Islands Community Bank, N. A. (35437) in BEAUFORT, SC
2009-10-23Acquired American United Bank (57794) in LAWRENCEVILLE, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-11-06Acquired United Security Bank (22286) in SPARTA, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-14Acquired Satilla Community Bank (35114) in SAINT MARYS, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-10-22Acquired First Bank of Jacksonville (27573) in JACKSONVILLE, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-12Acquired Darby Bank & Trust Co. (14580) in VIDALIA, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-12Acquired Tifton Banking Company (57831) in TIFTON, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-15Acquired High Trust Bank (19554) in STOCKBRIDGE, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-15Acquired One Georgia Bank (58238) in ATLANTA, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-02-24Acquired Central Bank of Georgia (5687) in ELLAVILLE, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-07-06Acquired Montgomery Bank & Trust (19498) in AILEY, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2013-12-23Acquired Prosperity Bank (24963) in SAINT AUGUSTINE, FL
2014-07-01Acquired The Coastal Bank (20134) in SAVANNAH, GA
2015-05-22Acquired Merchants & Southern Bank (18116) in GAINESVILLE, FL
2016-03-11Acquired The Jacksonville Bank (34941) in JACKSONVILLE, FL
2018-05-25Acquired Atlantic Coast Bank (45826) in JACKSONVILLE, FL
2018-06-29Acquired Hamilton State Bank (57810) in HOSCHTON, GA
2019-07-01Moved bank headquarters from MOULTRIE, GA to ATLANTA, GA
2019-07-01Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2019-07-01Acquired Fidelity Bank (21440) in ATLANTA, GA