American National Bank & Trust, History

The following are a list of major historical events for American National Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.

1976-11-29Institution established: Original name:American National Bank
1995-01-31Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1997-05-01Reorganized.
2013-01-01Changed name to American National Bank & Trust
2015-08-14Acquired The First National Bank of Chillicothe (3136) in CHILLICOTHE, TX