Home > American National Bank and Trust Company > History
American National Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for American National Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1909-02-09 | Institution established: Original name:American National Bank & Trust Company of Danville | |
1984-09-01 | Changed name to American National Bank and Trust Company | |
1996-03-14 | Acquired Mutual Savings Bank, FSB (30201) in DANVILLE, VA | |
2006-04-01 | Acquired Community First Bank (35277) in LYNCHBURG, VA | |
2011-07-01 | Acquired MidCarolina Bank (34454) in BURLINGTON, NC | |
2015-01-01 | Acquired Franklin Community Bank, National Association (57259) in ROCKY MOUNT, VA | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired HomeTown Bank (58163) in ROANOKE, VA |