Home > American National Bank > History
American National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for American National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1964-12-02 | Institution established: Original name:West Omaha National Bank | |
1975-03-03 | Changed name to American National Bank | |
1990-11-30 | Acquired Heritage Federal Savings Bank of Omaha (32896) in OMAHA, NE | |
1994-03-21 | Acquired Northern Bank (8349) in OMAHA, NE | |
1995-04-01 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1998-08-22 | Acquired The Fairbury State Bank (15402) in FAIRBURY, NE | |
1998-08-29 | Acquired American National Bank of Sarpy County (27528) in PAPILLION, NE | |
1998-09-12 | Acquired American National Bank (32972) in NEBRASKA CITY, NE | |
2003-06-14 | Acquired American National Bank (57156) in LINCOLN, NE | |
2005-02-21 | Acquired Peoples National Bank (22712) in COUNCIL BLUFFS, IA | |
2015-09-01 | Acquired Western Bank, National Association (10203) in SAINT PAUL, MN |