Home > American Nation Bank > History
American Nation Bank, History
The following are major historical events for American Nation Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1983-05-02 | Institution established: Original name:American National Bank | |
1988-09-22 | Acquired The Security State Bank (9878) in COMANCHE, OK | |
1990-07-26 | Acquired The Bank of Wilson (15740) in WILSON, OK | |
2010-04-01 | Acquired American Bank, National Association (15836) in KELLER, TX | |
2016-06-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-06-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-06-27 | Changed name to American Nation Bank |