Home > American Momentum Bank > History
American Momentum Bank, History
The following are major historical events for American Momentum Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2006-10-25 | Institution established: Original name:American Momentum Bank | |
2009-01-09 | Acquired Texas First Bank (21960) in COLLEGE STATION, TX | |
2011-07-22 | Acquired Southshore Community Bank (58056) in APOLLO BEACH, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-07-22 | Acquired LandMark Bank of Florida (35244) in SARASOTA, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2012-04-13 | Acquired Brazos Valley Bank, National Association (57693) in COLLEGE STATION, TX | |
2014-01-15 | Moved bank headquarters from TAMPA, FL to COLLEGE STATION, TX | |
2014-01-15 | Reorganized. | |
2019-01-18 | Acquired Commercial State Bank (17687) in ANDREWS, TX | |
2020-02-29 | Acquired Security Bank (13408) in MIDLAND, TX |