Home > American Bank > History
American Bank, History
The following are major historical events for American Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1970-08-24 | Institution established: Original name:American National Bank | |
1985-07-01 | Changed name to American National Bank - South | |
1985-11-23 | Reorganized. | |
1989-11-01 | Changed name to American National Bank | |
1989-11-01 | Acquired American National Bank - Corpus Christi (26371) in CORPUS CHRISTI, TX | |
1996-01-02 | Changed name to American Bank, National Association | |
2001-05-31 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2006-12-31 | Acquired First National Bank of Goliad (3222) in GOLIAD, TX |