Home > Amboy Bank > History

Amboy Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Amboy Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1888-05-12Institution established: Original name:First National Bank South Amboy
1960-10-20Changed name to First National Bank South Amboy-Madison Township
1960-10-20Moved bank headquarters from SOUTH AMBOY, NJ to MADISON TOWNSHIP, NJ
1963-04-08Changed name to Amboy-Madison National Bank
1976-01-01Moved bank headquarters from MADISON TOWNSHIP, NJ to OLD BRIDGE TOWNSHIP, NJ
1991-12-01Changed name to Amboy National Bank
1991-12-01Moved bank headquarters from OLD BRIDGE TOWNSHIP, NJ to OLD BRIDGE, NJ
1991-12-01Acquired Amboy National Bank (32993) in ROCKY HILL, NJ
2008-02-19Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2008-02-19Changed name to Amboy Bank
2008-02-19Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD