Home > Amalgamated Bank > History
Amalgamated Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Amalgamated Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1923-04-14 | Institution established: Original name:The Amalgamated Bank of New York | |
1974-11-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1985-08-09 | Changed name to Amalgamated Bank of New York | |
2000-12-27 | Changed name to Amalgamated Bank | |
2001-12-26 | Acquired Amalgamated Trust Company (33443) in PASADENA, CA | |
2018-05-18 | Acquired New Resource Bank (58329) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA |