Home > Alpine Bank > History
Alpine Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Alpine Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1980-04-01 | Institution established: Original name:Valley Bank and Trust | |
1983-02-01 | Changed name to Alpine Bank and Trust | |
1987-05-26 | Acquired Alpine Bank (24218) in GLENWOOD SPRINGS, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank, Aspen (27532) in ASPEN, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank, Grand Junction (33210) in CLIFTON, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank (24473) in EAGLE, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank, Basalt (22306) in BASALT, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank, Carbondale (20937) in CARBONDALE, CO | |
1995-11-06 | Acquired Alpine Bank, Snowmass Village (21687) in SNOWMASS VILLAGE, CO | |
1995-12-05 | Changed name to Alpine Bank | |
2006-01-01 | Acquired First National Bank (33699) in TELLURIDE, CO |