Home > Alliant Bank > History
Alliant Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Alliant Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1888-02-20 | Institution established: Original name:Madison Bank | |
1988-09-09 | Acquired Bank of Hunnewell (13619) in HUNNEWELL, MO | |
1988-10-13 | Changed name to Madison-Hunnewell Bank | |
2000-12-26 | Changed name to Community First Bank of Missouri | |
2003-12-15 | Changed name to Alliant Bank |