Home > Affinity Bank > History
Affinity Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Affinity Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1928-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Newton Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
2004-01-01 | Changed name to Newton Federal Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2017-04-27 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2017-04-27 | Reorganized. | |
2020-01-10 | Acquired AFFINITY BANK (57264) in ATLANTA, GA | |
2021-01-20 | Changed name to Affinity Bank. | |
2023-09-15 | Changed name to Affinity Bank, National Association. | |
2023-09-15 | Changed Bank Class to N. | |
2023-09-15 | Changed Organization Type to COMMERCIAL BANK. | |
2023-09-15 | Institution becomes member of the Federal Reserve System. |