AB&T, History
The following are major historical events for AB&T, including mergers and acquisitions.
1999-04-28 | Institution established: Original name:Albany Bank & Trust, National Association | |
2002-01-09 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2009-03-31 | Changed name to AB&T NATIONAL BANK | |
2009-03-31 | Acquired AB&T National Bank (27207) in DOTHAN, AL | |
2014-01-01 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2016-12-31 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2016-12-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2016-12-31 | Changed name to AB&T | |
2022-06-30 | Moved bank headquarters from 2815 Meredyth Dr, ALBANY, GA to 2815 Meredyth Dr, ALBANY, GA. |