Home > 5Star Bank > History
5Star Bank, History
The following are major historical events for 5Star Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1980-06-10 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Citizens Industrial Bank | |
1985-11-05 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1985-11-05 | Changed name to Littleton U.S. Industrial Bank | |
1986-10-31 | Acquired Grand Junction U.S. Industrial Bank (91212) in GRAND JUNCTION, CO | |
1988-06-01 | Changed name to American Industrial Bank of Littleton | |
1990-06-13 | Changed name to AFBA Industrial Bank | |
1991-08-05 | Moved bank headquarters from LITTLETON, CO to COLORADO SPRINGS, CO | |
2000-10-11 | Changed name to 5 Star Bank | |
2009-05-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2009-05-01 | Changed name to 5Star Bank | |
2022-01-03 | Moved bank headquarters from PAIN AND STEWART STREETS, BUILDING 1485, PETERSON AFB, COLORADO SPRINGS, CO to 104 S Cascade Ave Ste 102, COLORADO SPRINGS, CO. |